Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre d’Ornellas

Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1953 BornParis
15 Aug 198431.3Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
4 Jul 199744.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
4 Jul 199744.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Naraggara
10 Oct 199744.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naraggara
19 Oct 200653.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
26 Mar 200753.9SucceededArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre d’Ornellas:
Archbishop Pierre d’Ornellas (born ) Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2006
  • s: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,157
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014