Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andris Kravalis

Auxiliary Bishop of Riga, Latvia

Titular Bishop of Migirpa

Titular See: (Institut Notre Dame de Vie)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1967 Born
1998²30.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Riga, Latvia
22 Aug 199932.1Ordained PriestPriest of Riga, Latvia
8 Mar 201951.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Riga, Latvia
8 Mar 201951.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Migirpa
4 May 201951.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Migirpa

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andris Kravalis (VIAF: 305381699)
Bishop Andris Kravalis (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Riga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGulbene
Ordained BishopSt. James, Cathedral, Riga, Archdiocese of Riga

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Riga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2019
  • ob: CB, 8 Mar 2019
  • op: CB, 27 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 6 May 2019

Quantcast