Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Riga

Archidioecesis Rigensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Zbigņev Stankevičs, Archbishop
  • Jānis Pujats, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Janis Cakuls, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 25 October 1923
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Latvia
  • Square Kilometers: 23,587 (9,110 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Metropolijas Kurija, Maza Pils iela 2/a, 1050 Riga, Latvia
  • Telephone: (672)24.314; 27.266
  • Fax: 20.060

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Riga
22 September 1918ErectedDiocese of Riga (erected)
Archdiocese of Riga
25 October 1923ElevatedDiocese of Riga Archdiocese of Riga
1 November 1924Territory LostArchdiocese of Riga Apostolic Administration of Estonia (erected)
8 May 1937ElevatedArchdiocese of Riga (became a Metropolitan)
2 December 1995Territory LostArchdiocese of Riga Diocese of Rēzekne-Aglona (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Riga
1950476,9631,950,50224.5%126ap1951
1970268,5602,334,00011.5%1511511,778178ap1971
1980245,0002,500,0009.8%125101351,81410178ap1981
1990500,0002,667,00018.7%9281005,0008180ap1991
1999170,0001,435,00011.8%1914335,1511143757ap2000
2000170,0001,420,00012.0%2114354,8571144359ap2001
2001170,0001,430,00011.9%2311345,0001114262ap2002
2002180,0001,400,00012.9%2611374,8641114666ap2003
2003200,0001,370,00014.6%2811395,1281117466ap2004
2004200,0001,350,00014.8%3012424,7611126870ap2005
2010220,0001,230,00017.9%3510454,8881105373ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 20 Dec 2013