Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonijs Springovičs

Deceased

Archbishop of Riga, Latvia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1876Born
24 Jun 190124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Riga, Latvia
14 Apr 192043.4AppointedBishop of Riga, Latvia
22 Aug 192043.8Ordained BishopBishop of Riga, Latvia
25 Oct 192346.9AppointedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
1 Oct 195881.9DiedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Antonijs Springovičs
Archbishop Antonijs Springovičs (born , died ) Archbishop of Riga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRēzekne (Rositten)

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,371
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 51
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast