Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valerians Zondaks

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Riga, Latvia

Titular Bishop of Tabaicara

Auxiliary Bishop of Liepāja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1908Born
8 May 193224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Riga, Latvia
28 Oct 197264.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Riga, Latvia
28 Oct 197264.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabaicara
28 Oct 197264.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liepāja, Latvia
12 Nov 197264.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabaicara
27 Sep 198678.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Valerians Zondaks
Bishop Valerians Zondaks (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Riga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilaka
Ordained BishopVatican Grotto, Lithuanian Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,035

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast