Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduards Pavlovskis

Bishop of Jelgava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1950 BornBresne
25 May 197524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Riga, Latvia
22 Jul 201160.9AppointedBishop of Jelgava, Latvia
10 Sep 201161.0Ordained BishopBishop of Jelgava, Latvia
20 Jun 201261.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Liepāja, Latvia
7 Sep 201363.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Liepāja, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Eduards Pavlovskis:
Bishop Eduards Pavlovskis (born ) Bishop of Jelgava

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jelgava.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2: CB, 22 Jul 2011
  • c2+: CB, 10 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,139
  • ab: CB, 20 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 8 Sep 2013