Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Viktors Stulpins

Bishop of Liepāja, Latvia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1971 Born
1 Jun 199523.6Ordained PriestPriest of Riga, Latvia
20 Jul 201341.8AppointedBishop of Liepāja, Latvia
7 Sep 201341.9Ordained BishopBishop of Liepāja, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Viktors Stulpins
Bishop Viktors Stulpins (born ) Bishop of Liepāja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Liepāja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jul 2013
  • ob: CB, 20 Jul 2013
  • c2+: CB, 7 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,864

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast