Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juozapas Skvireckas

Deceased

Archbishop of Kaunas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1873BornPasiluciai
24 Jun 189925.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 191945.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
10 Mar 191945.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
13 Jul 191945.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
5 Apr 192652.5AppointedArchbishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
13 May 192652.7InstalledArchbishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
3 Dec 195986.2DiedArchbishop of Kaunas, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Juozapas Skvireckas:
Archbishop Juozapas Skvireckas (born , died ) Archbishop of Kaunas

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013