Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vincentas Cardinal Sladkevičius, M.I.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kaunas

Cardinal-Priest of Spirito Santo alla Ferratella

Member of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1920BornGuroniai
25 Mar 194423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kaišiadorys, Lithuania
14 Nov 195737.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kaišiadorys, Lithuania
14 Nov 195737.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Abora
25 Dec 195737.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abora
1971²50.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
15 Jul 198261.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kaišiadorys, Lithuania
28 Jun 198867.8Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198867.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Spirito Santo alla Ferratella
10 Mar 198968.5AppointedArchbishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
4 May 199675.7RetiredArchbishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
28 May 200079.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kaunas, Lithuania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincentas Sladkevičius:
Vincentas Cardinal Sladkevičius M.I.C. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kaunas

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
  • a cardinal for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,849
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • qmic: CB, 2 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015