Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel-Joseph Bourguignon d’Herbigny, S.J. †

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1880BornLille, France
29 Aug 191030.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
11 Feb 192645.8AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
11 Feb 192645.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ilium
29 Mar 192645.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ilium
31 Mar 193453.9ResignedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
Jul 1937³57.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Ilium
23 Dec 195777.6DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel-Joseph Bourguignon d’Herbigny:
Bishop Michel-Joseph Bourguignon d’Herbigny S.J. (born , died ) Official Emeritus of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013