Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pie Eugène Joseph Neveu, A.A. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Moscow, Russian Federation

Titular Bishop of Citrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1877Born
18 Mar 190528.0Ordained PriestPriest of Augustinians of the Assumption
11 Mar 192649.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Moscow, Russian Federation
11 Mar 192649.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Citrus
21 Apr 192649.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Citrus
17 Oct 194669.6DiedApostolic Administrator of Moscow, Russian Federation

MicroData Summary for Pie Eugène Joseph Neveu
Bishop Pie Eugène Joseph Neveu A.A. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Moscow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGien, France

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,947
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,926, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast