Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antanas Louis Deksnys

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular Bishop of Lavellum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1906Born
30 May 193125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kaunas, Lithuania
12 Apr 196962.9AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
12 Apr 196962.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lavellum
15 Jun 196963.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lavellum
7 Jun 198478.0RetiredOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
5 May 199992.9DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Antanas Louis Deksnys (VIAF: 314862977)
Bishop Antanas Louis Deksnys (born , died ) Official Emeritus of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceButaniškiai, Lithuania
Ordained PriestKaunas, Archdiocese of Kaunas, Lithuania

  • a priest for 67.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast