Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manfred Müller

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1926BornAugsburg
24 Jun 195225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
3 Jan 197245.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
3 Jan 197245.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Iubaltiana
25 Mar 197245.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iubaltiana
16 Jun 198255.5AppointedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
18 Sep 198255.8InstalledBishop of Regensburg, Germany
15 Jan 200275.1RetiredBishop of Regensburg, Germany
20 May 201588.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Manfred Müller:
Bishop Manfred Müller (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 20 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 21 May 2015