Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf Schmid

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

Titular Bishop of Dionysiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1914BornSchiers
26 Jun 193824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
3 Jan 197257.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
3 Jan 197257.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysiana
25 Mar 197257.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysiana
11 Jul 199076.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
24 Jun 201298.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Rudolf Schmid:
Bishop Rudolf Schmid (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

  • a priest for 74.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 25 Jun 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013