Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vilhelms Nuks

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Riga

Titular Bishop of Acci


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1938BornAizelksni
25 Mar 196426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Riga, Latvia
23 Nov 198749.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Riga, Latvia
23 Nov 198749.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Acci
8 Dec 198749.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acci
27 Feb 199355.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Vilhelms Nuks:
Bishop Vilhelms Nuks (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Riga

  • a priest for 28.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,516
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013