Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Telšiai (-Klaipeda)

Dioecesis Telsensis (-Klaipedensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jonas Boruta, S.J., Bishop
  • Linas (Genadijus) Vodopjanovas, O.F.M., Auxiliary Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • United: 24 December 1991
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kaunas
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Lithuania
  • Square Kilometers: 13,373 (5,165 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://telsiai.lcn.lt/
  • Mailing Address: Karedros 5, 87131 Telsiai, Lietuva
  • Telephone: (444)60.636
  • Fax: 52.300

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Telšiai
4 April 1926ErectedDiocese of Telšiai (erected)
Diocese of Telšiai (-Klaipeda)
24 December 1991UnitedTerritorial Prelature of Klaipeda (suppressed)
Diocese of Telšiai
Diocese of Telšiai (-Klaipeda)
28 May 1997Territory LostArchdiocese of Kaunas
Diocese of Panevėžys
Diocese of Telšiai (-Klaipeda)
Diocese of Šiauliai (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Telšiai
1950385,872401,30696.2%135ap1951
19701501500131ap1971
1980400,0001301303,076131ap1981
1990400,0001121123,571134ap1991
Diocese of Telšiai (-Klaipeda)
1999600,000731,04482.1%127171444,1662965142ap2000
2000600,000730,00082.2%125171424,2254060142ap2001
2001600,000730,00082.2%124111354,4441731142ap2002
2002600,000730,00082.2%126131394,3161730142ap2003
2003533,689684,46678.0%12891373,8951450143ap2004
2004541,765696,80677.7%12861344,0431763143ap2005
2010581,000725,90080.0%144131573,7001339148ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 6 Jun 2013