Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kęstutis Kėvalas

Bishop of Telšiai (-Klaipeda), Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1972 Born
29 Jun 200028.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kaunas, Lithuania
27 Sep 201240.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
27 Sep 201240.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Abziri
24 Nov 201240.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abziri
20 Apr 201745.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Telšiai (-Klaipeda), Lithuania
18 Sep 201745.5SucceededBishop of Telšiai (-Klaipeda), Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Kęstutis Kėvalas
Bishop Kęstutis Kėvalas (born ) Bishop of Telšiai (-Klaipeda)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaunas, Archdiocese of Kaunas
Ordained BishopResurrection of Christ, Church, Kaunas, Archdiocese of Kaunas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Telšiai (-Klaipeda).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Sep 2012
  • ob: CB, 27 Sep 2012
  • c2+: CB, 24 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,605
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Apr 2017
  • s: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 18 Sep 2017