Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jonas Kauneckas

Bishop Emeritus of Panevėžys


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1938 BornTroyoniškis
22 May 197739.0Ordained PriestPriest of Telšiai, Lithuania
13 May 200061.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Telšiai (-Klaipeda), Lithuania
13 May 200061.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Forconium
5 Aug 200062.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forconium
5 Jan 200263.6AppointedBishop of Panevėžys, Lithuania
6 Jun 201375.0RetiredBishop of Panevėžys, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Jonas Kauneckas:
Bishop Jonas Kauneckas (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Panevėžys

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Panevėžys.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,813
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013