Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lionginas Virbalas, S.J.

Archbishop Emeritus of Kaunas, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1961 Born
30 May 199129.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
27 Sep 200342.2Perpetual VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
6 Jun 201351.9AppointedBishop of Panevėžys, Lithuania
10 Aug 201352.0Ordained BishopBishop of Panevėžys, Lithuania
11 Jun 201553.9AppointedArchbishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
1 Mar 201957.6ResignedArchbishop of Kaunas, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Lionginas Virbalas (VIAF: 5803154260351724480009)
Archbishop Lionginas Virbalas S.J. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kaunas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiržai
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Panevezys, Diocese of Panevėžys

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kaunas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2013
  • ob: CB, 13 Jun 2013
  • c2+: CB, 10 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,846
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 2 Mar 2019

Quantcast