Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Audrys Juozas Cardinal Bačkis

Archbishop Emeritus of Vilnius

Cardinal-Priest of Nativitą di Nostro Signore Gesł Cristo a Via Gallia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1937 BornKaunas
18 Mar 196124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kaunas, Lithuania
5 Aug 198851.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Meta
5 Aug 198851.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Netherlands
4 Oct 198851.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Meta
24 Dec 199154.9AppointedArchbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
3 Mar 199255.1InstalledArchbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
21 Feb 200164.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200164.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Nativitą di Nostro Signore Gesł Cristo a Via Gallia
5 Apr 201376.2RetiredArchbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Audrys Juozas Bačkis:
Cardinal Audrys Juozas Bačkis (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vilnius

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Vilnius.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,819
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013