Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Linas (Genadijus) Vodopjanovas, O.F.M.

Bishop of Panevėžys, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1973 Born
4 Jun 199319.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
15 Aug 199623.1Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
15 Aug 199926.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
15 Jul 200027.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 Feb 201238.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Telšiai (-Klaipeda), Lithuania
11 Feb 201238.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Quiza
14 Apr 201238.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Quiza
20 May 201642.9AppointedBishop of Panevėžys, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Linas (Genadijus) Vodopjanovas
Bishop Linas (Genadijus) Vodopjanovas O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Panevėžys

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeringa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Panevėžys.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2012
  • ob: CB, 18 Feb 2012
  • c2: CB, 7 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,419
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast