Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenijus Bartulis

Bishop of Šiauliai, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1949 Born
30 May 197626.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 199747.4AppointedBishop of Šiauliai, Lithuania
29 Jun 199747.5Ordained BishopBishop of Šiauliai, Lithuania
25 Nov 200050.9AppointedBishop of Lithuania, Military
19 Jun 201060.5ResignedBishop of Lithuania, Military

MicroData Summary for Eugenijus Bartulis
Bishop Eugenijus Bartulis (born ) Bishop of Šiauliai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaunas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Šiauliai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,027

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017