Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincentas Borisevicius

Deceased

Bishop of Telšiai, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1887Born
29 May 191022.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 194052.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Telšiai, Lithuania
3 Feb 194052.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lysias
10 Mar 194052.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lysias
21 Jan 194456.1AppointedBishop of Telšiai, Lithuania
18 Nov 194658.9DiedBishop of Telšiai, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Vincentas Borisevicius
Bishop Vincentas Borisevicius (born , died ) Bishop of Telšiai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBebrininkai

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1940, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast