Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jānis Bulis

Bishop of Rēzekne-Aglona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1950 BornBrigi
22 May 197726.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 199140.7AppointedBishop of Liepāja, Latvia
24 Jun 199140.8Ordained BishopBishop of Liepāja, Latvia
7 Dec 199545.3AppointedBishop of Rēzekne-Aglona, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Jānis Bulis:
Bishop Jānis Bulis (born ) Bishop of Rēzekne-Aglona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rēzekne-Aglona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,547
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,639
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,732
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 11 Jun 2015