Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thierry Marie Scherrer

Bishop of Laval


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1959 BornVersailles
26 Jun 198829.4Ordained PriestPriest of Aix (-Arles), France
21 May 200849.3AppointedBishop of Laval, France
6 Jul 200849.5Ordained BishopBishop of Laval, France

MicroData Summary for Thierry Marie Scherrer:
Bishop Thierry Marie Scherrer (born ) Bishop of Laval

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Laval.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,779

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013