Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernard Louis Auguste Paul Cardinal Panafieu

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Marseille, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Gregorio Barbarigo alle Tre Fontane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1931Born
17 Dec 195524.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
22 Apr 195625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
18 Apr 197443.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Annecy, France
18 Apr 197443.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibilis
9 Jun 197443.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibilis
30 Nov 197847.8AppointedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
24 Aug 199463.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Marseille, France
22 Apr 199564.2SucceededArchbishop of Marseille, France
21 Oct 200372.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200372.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Gregorio Barbarigo alle Tre Fontane
12 May 200675.2RetiredArchbishop of Marseille, France
12 Nov 201786.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Marseille, France

MicroData Summary for Bernard Louis Auguste Paul Panafieu (VIAF: 219347419)
Bernard Louis Auguste Paul Cardinal Panafieu (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Marseille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâtellerault, Diocese of Poitiers
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSainte-Cécile, Cathedral, Albi, Archdiocese of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)
Death PlaceHospital, Carpentras, Archdiocese of Avignon
Buried Place (Original)Sainte-Marie Majeure, Cathedral, Marseille, Archdiocese of Marseille

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
  • a cardinal for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 May 2006
  • d: CB, 13 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back), Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jul 2018

Quantcast