Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Renauld Marie François Dupont de Dinechin

Bishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France

Note/Previous Titular See: (Institut Notre Dame de Vie)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1958 Born
19 Dec 198729.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
25 Jun 198830.2Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
21 May 200850.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
21 May 200850.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana Minor
5 Sep 200850.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macriana Minor
30 Oct 201557.5AppointedBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
20 Dec 201557.7InstalledBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France

MicroData Summary for Renauld Marie François Dupont de Dinechin (VIAF: 107617054)
Bishop Renauld Marie François Dupont de Dinechin (born ) Bishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLille
Ordained DeaconSaint-Pierre de Chaillot, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,954
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2015
  • i: CB, 30 Oct 2015
  • od/c0: AJ, 25 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast