Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thibault Verny

Auxiliary Bishop of Paris

Titular Bishop of Lamzella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1965 BornParis
27 Jun 199832.6Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
25 Jun 201650.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
25 Jun 201650.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamzella
9 Sep 201650.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamzella

MicroData Summary for Thibault Verny
Bishop Thibault Verny (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paris

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Paris.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 25 Jun 2016
  • c34: AJ, 7 Jul 2016
  • c3+: CB, 9 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Sep 2016