Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Jean-Marie Jachiet

Auxiliary Bishop of Paris

Titular Bishop of Tigisi in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1962 BornParis
29 Jun 199634.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
25 Jun 201654.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
25 Jun 201654.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Numidia
9 Sep 201654.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Numidia

MicroData Summary for Denis Jean-Marie Jachiet (VIAF: 226730691)
Bishop Denis Jean-Marie Jachiet (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paris

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Paris.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 25 Jun 2016
  • c34: AJ, 7 Jul 2016
  • mn: AJ, 11 Jul 2016
  • c3+: CB, 9 Sep 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,097

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Oct 2016