Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yves Le Saux, Comm. l'Emm.

Bishop of Le Mans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1960 Born
22 Jun 198625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France
21 Nov 200847.9AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
25 Jan 200948.0Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Yves Le Saux
Bishop Yves Le Saux Comm. l'Emm. (born ) Bishop of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHennebont

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Le Mans.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,048

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jan 2017