Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Dassi Youfang, Comm. l'Emm.

Bishop of Bafia, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1967 Born
16 Jun 200133.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bafoussam, Cameroon
7 Nov 201649.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bafoussam, Cameroon
7 Nov 201649.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Oescus
7 Jan 201749.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oescus
13 May 202052.7AppointedBishop of Bafia, Cameroon
11 Jul 202052.9InstalledBishop of Bafia, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Dassi Youfang
Bishop Emmanuel Dassi Youfang Comm. l'Emm. (born ) Bishop of Bafia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaham
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Bafoussam, Diocese of Bafoussam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bafia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2016
  • ob: CB, 19 Nov 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,312
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 May 2020
  • i: CB, 21 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 11 Jul 2020

Quantcast