Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armand François M. Le Bourgeois, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1911BornAnnecy
17 Mar 193423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
22 Mar 196655.1AppointedBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France
5 Jun 196655.3Ordained BishopBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France
31 Jul 198776.5RetiredBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France
2 Feb 200594.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France

MicroData Summary for Armand François M. Le Bourgeois:
Bishop Armand François M. Le Bourgeois C.I.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny)

  • a priest for 70.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013