Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Antoine Marie Boffet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1921Born
12 Apr 194725.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 197048.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
24 Jun 197048.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
20 Sep 197049.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
21 Jun 197553.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
15 May 197654.6SucceededBishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
6 Sep 199674.9RetiredBishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
11 Sep 199776.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France

MicroData Summary for Louis Antoine Marie Boffet
Bishop Louis Antoine Marie Boffet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChaufailles

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast