Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Jean-Marie Souchu

Bishop of Aire et Dax, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1958 Born
1 Jun 198627.8Ordained PriestPriest of Orléans, France
28 Nov 200850.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
28 Nov 200850.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cataquas
18 Jan 200950.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cataquas
15 Nov 201759.3AppointedBishop of Aire et Dax, France
17 Dec 201759.3InstalledBishop of Aire et Dax, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Jean-Marie Souchu
Bishop Nicolas Jean-Marie Souchu (born ) Bishop of Aire et Dax

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuilly-sur-Seine, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Cathedral, Rennes, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aire et Dax.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,046
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2017
  • i: CB, 15 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018