Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Julien Claude Marie Lebrun

Bishop of Saint-Etienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1957 BornRouen
9 Jun 198426.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Denis, France
28 Jun 200648.7AppointedBishop of Saint-Etienne, France
9 Sep 200648.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Etienne, France
10 Sep 200648.9InstalledBishop of Saint-Etienne, France

MicroData Summary for Dominique Julien Claude Marie Lebrun:
Bishop Dominique Julien Claude Marie Lebrun (born ) Bishop of Saint-Etienne

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Etienne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 23 Nov 2014