Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Jacques Joatton, Ist. del Prado †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Etienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1930BornLyon
29 Jun 195726.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 195828.2IncardinatedPriest of Istituto del Prado
20 Apr 198857.8AppointedBishop of Saint-Etienne, France
26 Jun 198857.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Etienne, France
28 Jun 200675.9RetiredBishop of Saint-Etienne, France
22 Nov 201383.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Etienne, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Jacques Joatton:
Bishop Pierre Jacques Joatton Ist. del Prado (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Etienne

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,631
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • d: CB, 22 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013