Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Jean-Marie Charles de la Brousse

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dijon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1907Born
28 Jun 193730.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bourges, France
26 Jan 196254.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dijon, France
26 Jan 196254.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiochia Parva
5 May 196255.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antiochia Parva
11 Apr 196457.2SucceededBishop of Dijon, France
22 Apr 197467.2ResignedBishop of Dijon, France
7 Mar 198578.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Dijon, France

MicroData Summary for André-Jean-Marie Charles de la Brousse
Bishop André-Jean-Marie Charles de la Brousse (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dijon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourges

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018