Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Louis Joseph Dardel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Clermont, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1920Born
29 Jun 194626.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jan 197454.0AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
17 Mar 197454.1Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
27 Nov 199575.8RetiredBishop of Clermont, France
5 Aug 200585.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Louis Joseph Dardel
Bishop Jean Louis Joseph Dardel (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Clermont

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToulouse
Ordained BishopNotre Dame, Cathedral, Clermont Ferrand, Diocese of Clermont

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 29, Number 1,639

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast