Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Gay, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1901BornBourg-en-Bresse, France
9 Aug 192524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
13 Jan 194341.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
13 Jan 194341.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aezani
25 Mar 194341.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aezani
17 May 194544.0SucceededBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
29 Jan 196866.7ResignedBishop of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles
29 Jan 196866.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena
18 Feb 197169.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena
27 Aug 197776.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre), Guadeloupe, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Jean Gay:
Bishop Jean Gay C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Basse-Terre (et Pointe-à-Pitre)

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013