Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jules-Géraud Cardinal Saliège

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1870BornCrouzy-Haut
21 Sep 189525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Flour, France
29 Oct 192555.6AppointedBishop of Gap, France
6 Jan 192655.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
26 Jan 192655.9InstalledBishop of Gap, France
6 Dec 192858.7AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
14 Feb 192958.9InstalledArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
18 Feb 194675.9Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194675.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
5 Nov 195686.6DiedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France

MicroData Summary for Jules-Géraud Saliège:
Jules-Géraud Cardinal Saliège (born , died ) Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
  • a cardinal for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015