Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hippolyte-Marie de La Celle

Deceased

Bishop of Nancy (-Toul)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1863BornBeaune-d’Allier
24 Apr 188623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Moulins, France
18 Dec 191956.9AppointedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
11 Feb 192057.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
27 Aug 193067.6DiedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France

MicroData Summary for Hippolyte-Marie de La Celle:
Bishop Hippolyte-Marie de La Celle (born , died ) Bishop of Nancy (-Toul)

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013