Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène-Louis-Ernest Julien

Deceased

Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1856BornCanville-les-Deux-Églises
17 Jul 188125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rouen, France
22 Mar 191761.2AppointedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
8 May 191761.3Ordained BishopBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
24 May 191761.4InstalledBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
14 Mar 193074.2DiedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France

MicroData Summary for Eugène-Louis-Ernest Julien:
Bishop Eugène-Louis-Ernest Julien (born , died ) Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 22
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013