Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Firmin-Jules Guichard, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Brazzaville, Congo

Titular Bishop of Tadamata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1884Born
28 Oct 191025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
12 Jun 192237.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Brazzaville, Congo
12 Jun 192237.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tadamata
12 Nov 192237.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tadamata
27 Aug 193550.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Brazzaville, Congo
27 Apr 193651.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Brazzaville, Congo

MicroData Summary for Firmin-Jules Guichard
Bishop Firmin-Jules Guichard C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Brazzaville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorps-Nuds, France

  • a priest for 25.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018