Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marie Le Berre, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Gabon, Gabon

Titular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1819Born
21 Sep 184425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
7 Sep 187758.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées}, Gabon
7 Sep 187758.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia
28 Oct 187758.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia
16 Jul 189171.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Gabon, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie Le Berre (VIAF: 7392820)
Bishop Pierre-Marie Le Berre C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Gabon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeulliac, Diocese of Vannes, France
Ordained Bishop30, rue Lhomond, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 117
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017