Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Théophile Mbemba

Deceased

Archbishop of Brazzaville


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1917BornMpiaka
9 Jun 194629.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 196144.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Brazzaville, Congo
11 Nov 196144.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tubia
11 Feb 196244.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tubia
23 May 196447.0SucceededArchbishop of Brazzaville, Congo
14 Jun 197154.1DiedArchbishop of Brazzaville, Congo

MicroData Summary for Théophile Mbemba:
Archbishop Théophile Mbemba (born , died ) Archbishop of Brazzaville

  • a priest for 25.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013