Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Barthélémy Batantu

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Brazzaville, Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1925Born
28 Jun 195933.9Ordained PriestPriest of Brazzaville, Congo
15 Nov 197853.3AppointedArchbishop of Brazzaville, Congo
11 Feb 197953.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brazzaville, Congo
23 Jan 200175.5RetiredArchbishop of Brazzaville, Congo
26 Apr 200478.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Brazzaville, Congo

MicroData Summary for Barthélémy Batantu
Archbishop Barthélémy Batantu (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Brazzaville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMayala

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast