Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Claude Makaya Loembe

Bishop Emeritus of Pointe-Noire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1954 BornPointe-Noire
3 Jul 198329.1Ordained PriestPriest of Pointe-Noire, Congo
19 Dec 199440.6AppointedBishop of Pointe-Noire, Congo
22 Apr 199540.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pointe-Noire, Congo
31 Mar 201156.9RemovedBishop of Pointe-Noire, Congo

MicroData Summary for Jean-Claude Makaya Loembe:
Bishop Jean-Claude Makaya Loembe (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pointe-Noire

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pointe-Noire.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,592

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013