Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Auguste Gratien Pican, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1935Born
4 Sep 195520.5ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1963²27.8Solemn VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Apr 196631.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
10 Mar 198853.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
17 Apr 198853.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
19 Nov 198853.7SucceededBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
12 Mar 201075.0RetiredBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
23 Jul 201883.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Auguste Gratien Pican
Bishop Pierre Auguste Gratien Pican S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bayeux (-Lisieux)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranville
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bayeux, Diocese of Bayeux (-Lisieux)
Death PlacePetites Sœurs des Pauvres de la rue Picpus, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,535
  • d: CB, 23 Jul 2018
  • d.loc: AJ, 25 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 Jul 2018

Quantcast