Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prosper Paul Dodds, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Louis du Sénégal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1915BornSaint-Louis du Sénégal
23 Jul 193924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
13 Jun 194732.3AppointedPrefect of Ziguinchor, Senegal
10 Jul 195237.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ziguinchor, Senegal
10 Jul 195237.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bennefa
26 Oct 195237.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bennefa
14 Sep 195540.5AppointedBishop of Ziguinchor, Senegal
15 Feb 196650.9AppointedBishop of Saint-Louis du Sénégal
12 Jan 197357.9DiedBishop of Saint-Louis du Sénégal

MicroData Summary for Prosper Paul Dodds:
Bishop Prosper Paul Dodds C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Louis du Sénégal

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015