Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Paul

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Port Victoria o Seychelles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1935Born
21 Dec 196025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Port Victoria o Seychelles
17 Mar 197539.6AppointedBishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles
25 Jul 197539.9Ordained BishopBishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles
30 May 199458.8ResignedBishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles
21 Nov 200166.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Port Victoria o Seychelles

MicroData Summary for Félix Paul
Bishop Félix Paul (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Port Victoria o Seychelles

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort Victoria

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018